-
Posts
489 -
Joined
-
Days Won
2
Content Type
Profiles
Forums
Blogs
Gallery
Events
Store
Posts posted by arb
-
-
-
Dave,
As we both know, signatures are often hard to decipher and often don't really look like the last name of the individual. In this case, I think the signature is that of
Günther Scheuermann (20.11.1867-15.11.1936)
09.02.19 Führ. d. Freiw. Gren. R. 1
1914/18 Kom. d. Landw. Inf. R. 39
02.08.14 Kom. d. III./Landw. Inf. R. 33
01.10.13-02.08.14 b. St. d. Gren. R. 1 (Königsberg)
Oberstlt. 20-09-18 V
Major 01-10-13 S3s
Schemmann was still a Hptm. in the 1919 DAL, having been promoted on 27.01.13.
0 -
He was commander of Res. Inf. R. 80 01.10.15-05.01.17
1 -
-
Joel,
Some information for you
Andy
Kay Meyn (20.11.1872-18.12.1940)
31.01.28 m. Char. als Gen.Maj. d. Absch. bew.
01.02.26-31.01.28 Kom. d. 9. Inf. R. (Potsdam)
01.04.24-01.02.26 Leiter d. I. Lehrgang d. Inf. Sch.
31.10.22-01.04.24 Komdt. v. Magdeburg
01.01.21-31.10.22 Kom. d. III./12. Inf. R. (Magdeburg)
[02.09.18 b. Regiment eingetroffen]
25.08.18-13.01.19 Kom. d. Res. Inf. R. 230
01.10.12-1914 Chef 8./Inf. R. 175 (Graudenz)
[22.04.-26.05.08 k.z. III. Lehrkursus b.d. Inf. Schießsch.]
18.05.07-01.10.12 Chef 4./Jäg. B. 9 (Ratzeburg)
21.07.04-18.05.07 in 1./Jäg. B. 9 (Ratzeburg)
01.10.01-21.07.04 k.z. Kr. Akad.
01.04.98-31.08.01 Adj. d. Jäg. B. 9 (Ratzeburg)
1897-01.04.98 in 4./Jäg. B. 9 (Ratzeburg)
27.01.93-1896 in 2./Jäg. B. 9 (Ratzeburg)
27.01.93 Sek.Lt.
17.05.92 Port. Fähnr.
01.10.91 als Fahnenj. in Jäg. B. 9 eingetr.
Oberst 01-05-23 (2)
Oberstlt. 01-10-20 (52)
Major 27-01-15 P3p
Hptm. 18-05-07 F9f
Oberlt. 27-01-02 N4n
Leutn. 27-01-93 W5w
Erich Mansfeld (02.09.1867-??)
1943 Oberst a.D., Hamburg, Eppendorferstieg 4
31.12.20 d. Char. als Oberst u.d. Erlaubn. z. Tr. d. Unif. d. Füs. R. 73 erhalt.
05.11.20 d. Absch. bew.
1920 im Reichsw. Schützen R. 18
29.08.18 v.d. Armee
04.12.17-29.08.18 Kom. d. Inf. R. 116
05.05.17 verw.
12.09.16-04.12.17 Kom. d. Inf. R. 394
14.10.14-12.09.16 Kom. d. Res. Jäg. B. 9
02.08.14 Kom. d. II./Res. Inf. R. 75
01.10.13-02.08.14 b. St. d. Inf. R. 76 (Hamburg)
03.12.12-01.10.13 Chef 1./III. Stamm See B. (Cuxhaven)
21.11.08-03.12.12 Chef 5./III. See B.
01.08.08-21.11.08 im III. Stamm See B.
01.10.06-01.08.08 Chef 2./II. See B. (Wilhelmshaven)
27.01.03-30.09.06 Chef 9./Inf. R. 74 (Hannover)
19.11.01-27.01.03 in 4./Inf. R. 74 (Hannover)
08.07.00-19.11.01 im 3. Ostas. Inf. R.
01.04.00-08.07.00 k.b. Bez. Kom. Hannover als Adj.
01.01.00-31.03.00 k.z. Dienstl. b. Bez. Kom. Hannover
01.04-97-01.01.00 Adj. II./Inf. R. 164 (Hameln)
1896-01.04.97 Adj. II./Füs. R. 73 (Hannover)
1895 in 2./Füs. R. 73 (Hannover)
01.03.94-1894 in 14./Füs. R. 73 (Hannover)
01.10.93-28.02.94 k.z. Milit. Turnanst.
14.02.88-01.10.93 in 6./Füs. R. 73 (Hannover)
14.02.88 Sek.Lt.
14.05.87 Port. Fähnr.
22.09.86 als Fahnenj. in Füs. R. 73 eingetr.
Oberstlt. 18-08-18 S
Major 01-10-13 Bb
Hptm. 27-01-03 Ee
Prem.Lt. 14-07-95 Hh
Sek.Lt. 14-02-88
Fritz Jungé (29.05.1865-1936)
27.03.20 d. Char. als Gen.Maj. m. Wirkung v. 31.03.1920 erhalt.
11.03.19-?? Kom. d. Landw. Bez. I Cöln
11.03.19 m. Pens. z. Disp. gestellt
??-11.03.19 v.d. Armee
12.07.17 Kom. d. Landw. Inf. R. 84
26.01.17-12.07.17 Kom. d. Inf. R. 116
05.11.14-05.03.15 Kom. d. Inf. R. 135
02.08.14 b. Dir. d. Milit. Eisenb. Dir. 2 (Hanau)
22.05.12-02.08.14 Kom. d. I./Inf. R. 130 (Metz)
06.04.09-22.05.12 Lin. Komm. in Erfurt, U.d. Inf. R. 88
15.02.09-06.04.09 Eisenb. Lin. Komm. in Cassel, U.d. Inf. R. 88
22.04.05-15.02.09 Eisenb. Lin. Komm. in Münster, U.d. Inf. R. 88
15.09.04-22.04.05 k.z. Dienstl. b. gr. Gen. St. v. Inf. R. 88
19.09.01-15.09.04 Chef 7./Inf. R. 88 (Mainz)
01.04.97-19.09.01 Adj. d. 84. Inf. Brig. (Lahr)
1896-01.04.97 in 12./Inf. R. 25 (Rastatt)
[01.01.-01.04.97 k.z. Dienstl. b. St. d. 29. Div.]
[21.07.-19.09.95 k.z. Dienstl. b. St. d. XIV. AK]
[25.09.-09.10.94 k.z. Festungs u. Gen. St. Reise d. XIV. AK]
1895 in 6./Inf. R. 25 (Rastatt)
01.10.93-1894 in 11./Inf. R. 25 (Rastatt)
01.12.90-01.10.93 k.z. Bez. Kom. Offenburg als Adj.
1890-01.12.90 in 9./Inf. R. 25 (Rastatt)
1889 in 7./Inf. R. 25 (Rastatt)
1888 in 10./Inf. R. 25 (Rastatt)
1887 in 11./Inf. R. 25 (Straßburg)
20.02.85-1886 in 6./Inf. R. 25 (Straßburg)
20.02.85 Sek.Lt. m. Patent v. 14.02.1885
10.05.84 Port. Fähnr.
16.10.83 als Dreij. Freiw. in Inf. R. 25 eingetr.
Oberst 16-09-17 C
Oberstlt. 08-11-14 W
Major 04-08-09 C2c
Hptm. 18-03-99 X2x
Oblt. 14-09-93
Leutn. 14-02-85
I have no connection for these officers to Inf. R. 116, but I think they are the best candidates
Ferdinand Kühl (04.01.1871-??)
1955 Oberstlt. a.D., Elberfeld, Friedrich-Wilhelm Str. 1
1942 Oberstlt. a.D., Elberfeld, Adolf Hitler Str. 442
1920 Leiter d. Versorgungsamts Erbach i.O.
1918 Kom. d. Res. Inf. R. 88
01.10.13-1914 Chef MG./Inf. R. 88 (Mainz)
15.06.07-01.10.13 Chef 9./Inf. R. 88 (Mainz)
18.05.07-15.06.07 überz. Hptm. in Inf. R. 30
1903-18.05.07 in 2./Inf. R. 30 (Saarlouis)
01.04.02-1902 in 12./Inf. R. 30 (Saarlouis)
01.04.01-31.03.02 k.z. 3./Unteroffiz. Sch. Treptow
18.08.97-01.04.01 k.z. 3./Unteroffiz. Sch. Weißenels
1897-18.08.97 in 11./Inf. R. 30 (Saarlouis)
1896 in 1./Inf. R. 30 (Saarlouis)
1895 in 2./Inf. R. 30 (Saarlouis)
1894 in 11./Inf. R. 30 (Saarlouis)
1893 in 9./Inf. R. 30 (Saarlouis)
22.08.91-1892 in 11./Inf. R. 30 (Saarlouis)
22.08.91 Sek.Lt.
18.11.90 Port. Fähnr.
Major 24-12-14 Cc
Hptm. 18-05-07 W3w
Oberlt. 17-02-00 Mm
Leutn. 22-08-91
Otto Kühl (28.05.1872-06.06.1945)
06.06.45 als Oberstlt. a.D. in Kassel gest.
1920 Major, Kassel, Wigandstr. 16
25.07.10-1914 Chef 7./Inf. R. 135 (Diedenhofen)
20.04.10-25.07.10 überz. Hptm.
01.08.08-20.04.10 in 5./Inf. R. 135 (Diedenhofen)
01.09.05-31.07.08 in Schutztr. f. DOA
1905-30.08.05 in 4./Inf. R. 83 (Cassel)
01.10.03-1904 in 3./Inf. R. 83 (Cassel)
01.10.01-30.09.03 k.b. Bez. Kom. Marburg als Adj.
1901-01.10.01 in 4./Inf. R. 83 (Cassel)
[01.03.-31.07.99 k.z. Milit. Turnanst.]
[04.07.-30.07.98 k.z. Gew. Fabr. Erfurt]
1898-1900 in 9./Inf. R. 83 (Arolsen)
22.03.97-1897 in 4./Inf. R. 83 (Cassel)
1895-22.03.97 in 1./Inf. R. 70 (Saarbrücken)
20.05.93-1894 in 2./Inf. R. 70 (Saarbrücken)
20.05.93 Sek.Lt.
18.10.92 Port. Fähnr.
22.03.97 in Inf. R. 70 eingetr.
Major 18-08-16 Oo
Hptm. 20-04-10 Rr
Oberlt. 12-09-02 G3g
Leutn. 20-05-93 O6o
1 -
That would be Leonhard Lohrenz 1914 in Train A. 9 (Rendsburg)
0 -
His military career to 1914
Max Rudolph (03.03.1861-17.06.1925)
17.06.25 in Prenzlau gest.
18.12.13-1914 4. St. Offiz. b. Landw. Bez. IV Berlin
21.01.13-18.12.13 Bez. Offiz. b. Landw. Bez. I Berlin
21.01.13 m. Pens. z. Disp. gestellt
17.05.10-21.01.13 Kom. d. F./Gren. R. 9 (Stargard in Pomm.)
18.10.08-17.05.10 b. St. d. Gren. R. 9 (Stargard in Pomm.)
11.09.07-18.10.08 aggr. d. Gren. R. 9 (Stargard in Pomm.)
27.01.06-11.09.07 Chef 3./Gren. R. 9 (Stargard in Pomm.)
14.02.05-27.01.06 Chef 9./Inf. R. 112 (Mülhausen i.E.)
[22.07.-25.08.03 k.z. Lehrkursus d. Inf. Schießsch.]
01.04.01-14.02.05 Führ. 1./Unteroffiz. Sch. in Jülich, à l.s. Inf. R. 24
[22.06.-26.07.97 k.z. Lehrkursus d. Inf. Schießsch.]
17.11.96-01.04.01 Chef 10./Inf. R. 24 (Havelberg)
01.09.96-17.11.96 überz. Hptm. im Inf. R. 48
1896-01.09.96 in 4./Inf. R. 48 (Cüstrin)
1895 in 13./Inf. R. 48 (Cüstrin)
1894 in 9./Inf. R. 48 (Cüstrin)
01.10.92-1893 in 8./Inf. R. 48 (Cüstrin)
01.10.89-30.09.92 k.b. Bez. Kom. Landsberg als Adj.
[01.03.-31.07.88 k.z. Milit. Turnanst.]
[01.06.-30.06.87 k.z. Gew. Fabr. in Spandau]
[01.06.-13.07.86 k.z. Pion. B. 3]
1887-01.10.89 in 10./Inf. R. 48 (Cüstrin)
1886 in 9./Inf. R. 48 (Cüstrin)
28.10.84-1885 in 12./Inf. R. 48 (Cüstrin)
1884-28.10.84 in 11./Inf. R. 83 (Arolsen)
11.02.82-1883 in 7./Inf. R. 83 (Cassel)
11.02.82 Sek.Lt.
14.05.81 Port. Fähnr.
24.10.80 als Avantag. in Inf. R. 83 eingetr.
03.03.61 in Märkisch-Friedland geb.
Orden 1914: PRAO4 PDK DD3 NO3a
Oberstlt. 18-12-13 *
Major 11-09-07 F
Hptm. 01-09-96 B2b
Prem.Lt. 15-12-90
Sek.Lt. 11-02-82
*Char.
2 -
There were six active officers in the 1914 Rangliste with a PAEz1 or 2. Not one survived the war. So, bars with a PAEz are certainly possible, but how likely?
Name
Rang
Regt
Gef
Orden
Dreßler, von
Leutn.
Reit. Feldjäger
30.07.1918
PAEz1
Lange,
Leutn.
PB 7
03.11.1914
PAEz2
Rheinbaben, Frhr. v.
Leutn.
1. GRzF
14.09.1914
PKrO4 PAEz1 REKj3
Schulenburg, v. der
Oblt.
KR 1
12.08.1918
PAEz1
Thun, v.
Oblt.
GR 11
19.06.1915
PAEz1 ÖFJ4
Weber,
Leutn.
GPB
06.10.1914
PAEz1
There was an Oberlt. d.R. (Kür. R. 1) v. Rother who had PKrO4 PStJO PAEz2
and
one Leutn. d. Landw. Inf. I (Landw. Bez. Breslau I) Panteleit who had D3 PAEz1
It is certainly possible an officer was called back to service for the war and could have had and received the awards. I can't speak to that, however.
0 -
I think your Reinhardt is Bruno - 1914 a Hptm. in FAR 33 and in mid-1918 “Führ. d. FAR 34”. I say this because the Hptm. Binder mentioned in the recruiting advert was also in FAR 33 in 1914. He served in FAR 63 from the day he was promoted Leutn. until 18.12.12 when he was transferred to FAR 33.
It was common for officers from the same regiment to serve together in a Freikorps unit. Bruno was promoted Major on 22.03.16, and so senior enough to command an artillery unit in the Freikorps.
0 -
I believe the name in "von Ohnesorge." If the photo has anything to do with artillery, it would most likely be Feodor von Ohnesorge. 1914 a captain and "Lehrer an d. Feldart. Schießschule."
0 -
Joel,
His military career:
Andy
Hans Krug von Nidda (15.10.1867-09.06.1921)
14.03.19 d. Absch. m. Pens. u. d. Erlaubn. z. Tr. d. Unif. d. Inf. R. 96 bew.
23.05.17-14.03.19 Kom. d. Landw. Bez. IV Berlin
16.05.17 v.d. Armee
26.10.16-16.05.17 Kom. d. Res. Inf. R. 51
01.03.16-26.10.16 Kom. d. Ers. Battailone in Meiningen u. Eisenach
27.01.15-01.03.16 Kom. d. Inf. R. 96
01.10.13-27.01.15 Kom. d. II./Inf. R. 94 (Eisenach)
20.04.10-01.10.13 Adj. d. Kr. Akad., U.d. Garde Füs. R.
21.12.09-20.04.10 Dir. Mitgl. d. Kr. Akad.
27.01.03-21.12.09 Chef 3./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
12.09.02-27.01.03 überz. Hptm.
1902-12.09.02 in 2./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
1900-1901 in 8./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
1899 in 11./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
21.07.96-1898 in 10./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
01.10.93-21.07.96 k.z. Kr. Akad.
1893-01.10.93 in 5./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
1892 in 11./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
1891 in 8./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
1890 in 5./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
16.05.88-1889 in 3./Garde Füs. R. (Berlin)
16.05.88 Sek.Lt.
15.11.87 Port. Fähnr.
31.03.87 als Fahnenj. in Garde Füs. R. eingetr.
Orden 1914: PRAO4mKr PDK HP3a
Oberst 18-04-18 R
Oberstlt. 18-06-15 O
Major 10-09-10 Q2q
Hptm. 12-09-02 Q4q
Oblt. 14-07-95 Oo
Leutn. 16-05-88
1 -
When v. Seeckt retired on 08.10.1926, he was granted permission to wear the uniform of the III. Batl. of Inf. R. 9
Andy
0 -
23 hours ago, JohanH said:
That would be
Karl Hintze (07.10.1880-09.10.1954) mentioned in Keilig but not in Bradley
1922-01.04.23 im St. d. Art. Führ. I (Königsberg)
24.04.14-02.08.14 b. St. d. Feldart. R. 56 (Lissa)
1 -
Hello Joel,
Here is his military career.
Andy
Otto von Trautman (02.06.1859-30.05.1932)
30.05.32 in Hamburg gest.
22.04.19 in Genehm. seines Absch. Gesuches m. Pens. z. Disp. gestellt
??-22.04.19 v.d. Armee
08.06.18-1919 Komdt. v. Altona
26.03.18-08.06.18 v.d. Armee
03.12.17-26.03.18 Kom. d. 20. Inf. Div.
05.09.17-03.12.17 Kom. d. 71. Inf. Brig.
30.04.17-05.09.17 v.d. Armee
17.02.16-30.04.17 Kom. d. 237. Inf. Brig.
28.10.15-17.02.16 v.d. Armee
[24.09.15 E.K. I]
29.05.15-28.10.15 Kom. d. Inf. R. 75
02.01.15-29.05.15 Kom. d. Etappen Mun. Verwaltung b.d. 2. Armee
15.10.14-02.01.15 v.d. Armee
[13.09.14 E.K. II]
27.01.14-01.10.14 Kom. d. Inf. R. 55 (Detmold)
18.08.11-27.01.14 b. St. d. Füs. R. 39 (Düsseldorf)
15.12.06-18.08.11 Kom. d. I./Füs. R. 39 (Düsseldorf)
15.04.04-15.12.06 aggr. d. Füs. R. 39 (Düsseldorf)
[10.07.-26.07.00 k.z. Gen. St. Reise d. IX. AK]
22.03.97-15.09.04 Chef 6./Inf. R. 162 (Lübeck)
[06.06.95-17.07.95 k.z. Milit. Schießsch.]
27.03.94-22.03.97 Chef 10./Inf. R. 76 (Lübeck)
01.11.93-27.03.94 in 12./Inf. R. 76 (Hamburg)
01.11.90-01.11.93 k.b. Bez. Kom. Lübeck als Adj. v. Inf. R. 76
[10.06.-06.07.89 k.z. Gew. Fabr. i. Danzig]
01.13.88-01.11.90 in 3./Inf. R. 76 (Hamburg)
01.10.87-28.02.88 k.z. Milit. Turnanst.]
1887 in 4./Inf. R. 76 (Hamburg)
[18.06.-19.07.85 k.z. Pion. B. 9]
1885-1886 in 12./Inf. R. 76 Lübeck)
1884 in 11./Inf. R. 76 Lübeck)
14.10.80-1883 in 3./Inf. R. 76 (Hamburg)
14.10.80 Sek.Lt.
13.11.79 Port. Fähnr.
20.07.79 Unteroffiz.
22.03.79 als Avantag. in Inf. R. 76 eingetr.
02.06.59 in Gatow, Osthavelland geb.
Orden 1914: PRAO4 PKrO3 PDK MG3 ÖFJ2b SK3
Gen.Maj. 18-04-17 -
Oberst 17-02-14 S
Oberstlt. 19-07-11 W
Major 15-09-04 R2r
Hptm. 14-05-94 Pp
Prem.Lt. 17-06-89
Sek.Lt. 14-10-80
0 -
Here are the particulars for the two infantry reserve Lts. named Kurt Albrecht and the active Lt. Albrecht in IR 64. It does not look like any of them is the man you are researching.
Andy
Alexis Albrecht (??-??)
1955 Geschäftsführer, Hannover, Podbielskistr. 323
1942 Major z.V., Hannover, Rühmkorffstr. 12
1940 Hptm. a.D., Hannover, Rühmkorffstr. 12
00.03.15 in MG./Res. Inf. R. 24 lei verw.
01.10.13-02.08.14 in 12./Inf. R. 64 (Angermünde)
1913-01.10.13 in 10./Inf. R. 64 (Angermünde)
01.10.12-1912 in 4./Inf. R. 64 (Prenzlau)
18.08.11-01.10.12 in 2./Inf. R. 64 (Prenzlau)
18.08.11 Leutn. m. Patent v. 20.08.09
18.10.10 Fähnr.
Name Vornamen Rang Regiment Patent geboren
Albrecht, Kurt Daniel Kurt Egon Leutn. d.R. IR 59 22.03.1914 11.10.1889
Albrecht, Kurt Kurt Erich Leutn. d.R. IR 88 18.12.1913
1 -
David,
There is a limited Stammliste of sorts for IR 14. It contain various Ranglisten and gives some information on those officers who entered and left the regiment over various periods up to 1900.
It shows a Capt. Joachim v. Restorff as Chef 6./IR 14 on 01.07.1814, b. St. II./IR 14 on 01.07.1815. He was promoted to Major on 13.11.1815 and retired on 20.03.1817. Unfortunately, that is all there is. That said, I think this is your man identified above.
Andy
1 -
Here is his career through the early days of the war as far as I can determine. His awards further clarify his assignments.
00.12.14 b. St. d. Res. Inf. R. 25 lei. verw.
09.08.14 in Pion. B. 30 angestellt
12.06.03-09.08.14 Schutztr. f. DOA [1907-1908 Adj.]
1903-12.06.03 in 1./Pion. B. 7 (Deutz)
15.07.01-1902 in 2./Pion. B. 7 (Deutz)
01.10.99-15.07.01 k.z. Art. u. Ing. Sch.
18.10.97-01.10.99 in 2./Pion. B. 7 (Deutz)
18.10.97 Sek.Lt.
22.03.97 Port. Fähnr.
18.07.96 in Pion. B. 7 eingetr.
Hptm. 27-01-13 A3a
Oberlt. 27-01-08 D2d
Leutn. 18-10-97 Z4z
Andy
1 -
Claudio,
That is a beautiful Pickelhaube!! Here is some information regarding its owner.
Andy
Rudolf Urtel (06.08.1875-??)
The 1941 Berlin Adreßbuch shows him as an Ingenieur living in Lichterfelde at Salzunger Pfad 11
22.03.15 Hptm. b. Personenkraftwagen Park d. Festung Metz
27.01.08-1914 Leutn./Oberlt. d.R. d. Kraftfahr B.
[1908 Reserve Dienstaltersliste shows his profession as Ober Ingenieur in Berlin-Friedenau]
27.01.04-27.01.08 Leutn. d. Res. d. IR 94
all commissions were Reserve commissions
Hptm. 22-03-15
Oberlt. 18-02-13
Leutn. 27-01-04
1 -
Claudio,
That is a really nice photograph. The notes on the back appear to have been written long after the fact and are a little confused. Here are the highlights of Heinrich's short military career.
Andy
Heinrich Gr. zu Rantzau (03.06.1871-20.04.1912)
20.04.12 infolge einer Operation an Herzschwäche zu Berlin gestorben
22.03.07-20.04.12 k. als Milit. Attaché b.d. Gesandtschaft i. Bern
12.03.07-22.03.07 k.z. Dienstl. b. gr. Gen. St.
01.11.05—12.03.07 k.z. Dienstl. b. Gen. St. d. XIV. AK, d. Komdo ist einer Versetzung gleichzuachten
16.03.05-01.11.05 aggr. d. Gen. St., b. gr. Gen. St.
01.04.03-16.03.05 k.z. Dienstl. b. gr. Gen. St.
01.10.98-21.07.01 k.z. Kr. Akad.
16.04.92-01.10.98 Kompanie Offizer im Garde Füs. R.
16.04.92 Sek.Lt.
17.12.91 Port. Fähnr.
01.06.91 als Fahnenj. in Garde Füsilier R. eingetr.
Major 18-10-11
Hptm. 22-04-05
Oberlt. 14-09-00
Sek.Lt. 16-04-92
Vater: Landtagsmarschall, Wirkl. Geh. Rat. m.d. Präd. Excellenz
Mutter: Karoline, geb. Gräfin von Reventlow a.d. H. Wittenberg
Gemählin: Editha, geb. von Arenstedt
Quelle: Eberhardt, Magnus von "Offizier Stammliste des Garde Füsilier Regiments von 1826 bis 1918, nebst Liste der Offiziere der Beurlaubtenstandes (Reserve und Garde Füsiulier Landwehr Regiment) sowie der Sanitätsoffiziere und Zahlmeister" 529 S., Klasing; Berlin 1922 Seite 264
0 -
-
The 1870 Marine Rangliste shows the "Hohenzollernsche Denkmünze" among his awards and decorations. I believe that is the one you are asking about.
1 -
Seems he had a very short military career for a man of his age. I can't tell you where he might have seen combat.
Andy
Karl Siegmund Schwarzschild
11.05.1916 he died in Potsdam, having last served on the staff of "General der Fußartillerie 10"
02.09.1915 promoted to Leutn. d. Landwehr Fußartillerie 1. Aufgebots from Landwehr Bez. Potsdam. At this time he was serving with the I. Ersatz Batl. of Fußart. R. 8
09.10.1873 born in Frankfurt a.M.
0 -
Perhaps this list might be of some help.
His awards from the 1898 Prussian Rangliste- immediately after he left UR 19.
PRAO 4 Preußen Roter Adler 4. Kl.
HEK3 Fürstl. Hohenzollern. Ehrenkeuz 3. Kl.
LH.EK2 Lippe Hausorden Ehrenkreuz 2. Kl
WV2 Waldeck Militär Verdienstkreuz 2. Kl.
WK3c Württ. Kronenorden, Ritterkreuz
WF3a Württ. Friederichs Orden Ritterkreuz 1. Kl.
WMD1 Würrt. Dienstauszeichnung 1. Kl.
JZ4 Japan Orden d. heiligen Schatzes, Offizierkreuz
NgL4 Nassau Hausorden vom goldenen Löwen 4. Kl.
RA2 Russisch St. Annen Orden 2. Kl.
also, in the 1897 Württ. Rangliste he is shown as having the "silberne Jubiläums Medaille, " which does not show up in the Prussian Rangliste.
Andy
0 -
Claudio,
Here are two Stammlisten entries regarding Frhr. v. Röder. The first is from Hus. R. 1 and the 2nd from Drag. R. 14. He commanded the 27. Kav. Brig. until 19.10.1905. Based on this information, he served in UR 19. The HR 1 entry shows him having an EK2. I think this is a mistake, as there is not evidence anywhere that he had an EK.
Andy
0
Unidentified WW1 Luftstreitkraefte Signatures
in Germany: All Eras: Signature Database
Posted · Edited by arb
The last name is Berendonck. There was only one Prussian officer by that name, Leutn. Gerhard Berendonck (1914 in Fußart. R. 8). I have no connection to the air forces for him. Perhaps Gunnar does.
Andy