-
Posts
3,674 -
Joined
-
Last visited
-
Days Won
9
Content Type
Profiles
Forums
Blogs
Gallery
Events
Store
Everything posted by hucks216
-
Imperial 1914-1918 Leyser, Hans von
hucks216 posted a topic in Germany: All Eras: Signature Database
Hans von Leyser 8 Ersatz Division (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section) -
Hauptmann Herold Kdr II/Inf.Rgt 186 Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section)
-
Imperial 1914-1918 Below, Eduard von
hucks216 posted a topic in Germany: All Eras: Signature Database
Generalleutnant Eduard von Below. Born: 29 Dec 1856 Died: 13 Jan 1942 Kdr 9 Infanterie Division Kdr V Armeekorps Pour le Mérite - 18 Aug 1917 Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section) -
Major Fritz Thomas. Kdr Inf.Rgt 182 Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section)
-
Imperial 1914-1918 Pforte, Max von der
hucks216 posted a topic in Germany: All Eras: Signature Database
Major Max von der Pforte. Kdr Inf.Rgt 181 Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section) -
Major Otto Salzmann. Kdr I/Inf.Rgt 180 Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section)
-
Korvettenkapitän Otto Schenk. Born: 17 Feb 1891 Died: 19 Dec 1972 Highest rank reached: Vizeadmiral Chef d. Zentralabt KMW Wilhelmshaven Küstenbefehlshaber Pommern Admiral d. norw. Südküste Admiral d. norw. Polarküste Chef E.K.K DKiG - 05 Feb 1942 Image: Führungsbuch
-
Major Reinhold Klebe. III/Gebirgsjäger-Rgt 98 Führer Gebirgsjäger-Rgt 99 Kriegsschule Dresden DKiG - 03 Nov 1943 Image: IAB citation
-
Oberleutnant Hans-Joachim Doergens. Born: 26 Dec 1912 Died: 07 Jun 1970 Highest rank reached: Major d.Res (WW-2) (attained rank of Oberstleutnant in Bundeswehr.) Chef 3./Pi.Btl 181 Führer Pi.Btl 225 Ritterkreuz - 26 Jun 1944 DKiG - 21 Mar 1943 Image: Soldbuch
-
-
Berthold Konrad Hermann Albert Speer. Born: 19 Mar 1905 Died: 01 Sep 1981 NSKK Wansee Generalbauinspektor für die Reichshauptstadt Minister of Armaments and War Production Image: Promotion Citation
-
Hauptmann Hanns Baier. Kdr Lehrstab A /Flakartillerieschule IV Kdr Fallschirm-Fla.-M.G.Btl (as a Major in 1941) Luftwaffen-Regiment Barenthin DKiG - 23 Jul 1943 (Image originally posted by Edgar in Identify Signature section)
-
Generalmajor Georg Neuffer. Born: 18 Apr 1895 Died: 11 May 1977 Highest rank reached: Generalleutnant Chief Of Staff of Air-Defence-Command Ruhrgebiet Chief Of Staff of the II. Flak-Corps Chief Of Staff of Air-Region-Command IV Chief Of Staff of Field-Air-Region-Command Moscow Commander of the 5th Flak-Division, Darmstadt Commander of the 20th Flak-Division, Tunisia In British Captivity (10 May 1943) Ritterkreuz - 01 Aug 1943 Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section)
-
Generalmajor Helmut Richter. Born: 22 Jun 1891 Died: 18 Apr 1977 Highest rank reached: General der Flakartillerie Department-Chief LP 4, Luftwaffe-Personnel-Office, RLM Higher Commander of Fortress-Flak-Artillery III Commander of the 11th Motorised-Flak-Division Commanding General of Flak-Artillery with Luftwaffe-Command South-East Commanding General of Flak-Artillery with the Commander-in-Chief of West-Fortifications Führer-Reserve OKL Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section)
-
Major Kurt von Pannwitz. Kdr Fliegerhorst-Kommandantur E (v) 203/III Image: Lapplandschild Citation (Image originally posted by Edgar in Identify Signature section)
-
General der Infanterie Rudolf Schniewindt. Born: 25th Dec 1875 Died: 16th Jul 1954 Befehlshaber in Wehrkreis IX Retired 1942 Pour le Mérite DKiS - 12 Jun 1943 Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section)
-
Vizeadmiral Walter Georg Lohmann. Born: 11th Dec 1891 Died: 13th Apr 1955 Kdr Marineschule Mürwik Admiral der KMD Hamburg c. Kdr d. Marine Bord Flakbrigade Nord DKiS - 09 Mar 1945 Image: Citation (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section)
-
Imperial 1914-1918 Ivernois, Wilhelm von
hucks216 posted a topic in Germany: All Eras: Signature Database
Major Wilhelm von Ivernois. Hus.Rgt 19 Inf.Rgt 179 (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section) -
Oberst Willy Franz Karl Pius von Livonius Born: 17th Apr 1871 Died: 10th Jul 1946 Highest rank reached: Generalmajor Kommandeur des Infanterie-Regiments „Fürst Leopold von Anhalt-Dessau“ (1. Magdeburgisches) Nr. 26 Kommandeur des 8. Lothringischen Infanterie-Regiments Nr. 159 Kommandeur der 94. Reserve-Infanterie-Brigade. Kommandeur des Königs Infanterie Regiments (6. Lothringisches) Nr. 145 (Image originally posted by Jens in Identify Signature section)
-
Egon Doerstling. Born: 28th Jan 1890 Died: 9th Nov 1965 Highest rank reached: General der Flieger (transferred to Air Force in 1916). Kdr II/Inf.Rgt 177 (Image originally posted by Chris Boonzaier in Identify Signature section)