ostprussenmann_new Posted November 28, 2011 Share Posted November 28, 2011 Can anyone tell me about him? Does anyone have any pictures of him? Trying to do a little research. Looking for Service Units, awards, etc. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Deruelle Posted November 29, 2011 Share Posted November 29, 2011 Hi, for the moment I have found only this info ! In the Ehrenrangliste from 1926, p. 728, von Steinberg MAjor a.D., inaktiv Offizier, from (FAR14) and served during WW1 with FAR 76. he received the BZ3bXEl on 1.10.1914. Christophe Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
ostprussenmann_new Posted November 29, 2011 Author Share Posted November 29, 2011 Thanks That is a great start. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Dave Danner Posted November 29, 2011 Share Posted November 29, 2011 Erwin Ludwig von Steinberg, born in Oberkirch, Baden, on 17 May 1867. Married 4 October 1894 to Luise Agnes Gustava Elsbeth (Else) Freiin von Berg. After leaving active duty, they lived in Eschenhof bei Winterbach, Baden. They had one son, Heinz Martin Alexander Erwin Bernhard, born 4 April 1909 in Eschenhof. 16.05.1888 - Portepée-Fähnrich, 1.GFAR 15.01.1889 - Sek.-Lieut., 1.GFAR 15.02.1890 - transferred to Reserve of 1.GFAR, commanded to FAR 15 19.05.1891 - returned to active duty with FAR 15, with Patent of 15.02.1889 18.08.1896 - Prem.-Lieut., transferred to FAR 10 01.04.1899 - commanded to the Great General Staff for one year 01.04.1900 - transferred to FAR 46 01.10.1900 - promoted to Hauptmann (no Patent) 01.04.1903 - transferred to FAR 14 as a Batterie-Chef 27.01.1904 - Patent as Hauptmann (P3p) 17.11.1906 - Retired 14.11.1916 - char. Major Besides the BZ3bXE Christoph noted above, he also had a peacetime RAO4, Centenary, and BZ3bXE. With wartime service, he probably would have qualified for the DA25 by 1918. Regards, Dave Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Dave Danner Posted November 29, 2011 Share Posted November 29, 2011 Apparently, he died on 28 November 1953. He and Else Freiin von Berg were divorced in 1925. They also had another son, Erwin, but he died in childhood (30 July 1895-24 July 1901). Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
ostprussenmann_new Posted November 29, 2011 Author Share Posted November 29, 2011 Erwin Ludwig von Steinberg, born in Oberkirch, Baden, on 17 May 1867. Married 4 October 1894 to Luise Agnes Gustava Elsbeth (Else) Freiin von Berg. After leaving active duty, they lived in Eschenhof bei Winterbach, Baden. They had one son, Heinz Martin Alexander Erwin Bernhard, born 4 April 1909 in Eschenhof. 16.05.1888 - Portepée-Fähnrich, 1.GFAR 15.01.1889 - Sek.-Lieut., 1.GFAR 15.02.1890 - transferred to Reserve of 1.GFAR, commanded to FAR 15 19.05.1891 - returned to active duty with FAR 15, with Patent of 15.02.1889 18.08.1896 - Prem.-Lieut., transferred to FAR 10 01.04.1899 - commanded to the Great General Staff for one year 01.04.1900 - transferred to FAR 46 01.10.1900 - promoted to Hauptmann (no Patent) 01.04.1903 - transferred to FAR 14 as a Batterie-Chef 27.01.1904 - Patent as Hauptmann (P3p) 17.11.1906 - Retired 14.11.1916 - char. Major Besides the BZ3bXE Christoph noted above, he also had a peacetime RAO4, Centenary, and BZ3bXE. With wartime service, he probably would have qualified for the DA25 by 1918. Regards, Dave Wow, That is some great information. Where did you find this Dave? Thank you very much. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Dave Danner Posted November 29, 2011 Share Posted November 29, 2011 Several places, mainly the Militär-Wochenblatt, DOA and some genealogy resources. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
ostprussenmann_new Posted December 20, 2011 Author Share Posted December 20, 2011 Since everyone's help, I was able to find out the following information if anyone is interested. 1. Reifezeugnis zum Portepeefähnrich, 7 April 1888 2. dem Reifezeugnis zum Offizier, 26 December 1888 3. Portepeefähnrich, ? 1889 4. Second Lieutenant, 15 February 1889. 5. Premierlieutenant, 1 September 1896 6. EK I, 17 November 1916 7. EK II, ? 1914/1915 8. dem Kreuz der Ritter vom königlichen Hausordens von Hohenzollern mit Schwertern, 29 September 1918 (temporary document) & 26 April 1918 (permanent document) 9. der Medaillie zum 100 Geburtstag von Kaiser Wilhelm I , 1897 10. dem Roten Adlerorden 4 Klasse, 17 November 1908 11. dem Ritterkreuz mit Eichenlaub und Schwerter des Ordens vom Zähringer Löwen. 1 October 1914 Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
ostprussenmann_new Posted December 20, 2011 Author Share Posted December 20, 2011 i don't know what this document is: Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
IrishGunner Posted December 21, 2011 Share Posted December 21, 2011 "Entlassungsschein aus den Heeresdienste" is his "Dismissal from Army Service" document. Effective 4 December 1918, signed by the Chief of Staff of the XIV Army Corps in Karlsruhe. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
speedytop Posted December 21, 2011 Share Posted December 21, 2011 Not "signed by the Chief of Staff" "Für den Chef des Stabes" [i.A.] > signed in by proxy of the Chief of Staff Uwe Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Dave Danner Posted December 21, 2011 Share Posted December 21, 2011 I would prefer "discharge" over "dismissal". To me, dismissal makes it seem like he was kicked out. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
ostprussenmann_new Posted December 21, 2011 Author Share Posted December 21, 2011 THat would be great if any of our members had his actual medals. Thanks for your help. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Recommended Posts
Create an account or sign in to comment
You need to be a member in order to leave a comment
Create an account
Sign up for a new account in our community. It's easy!
Register a new accountSign in
Already have an account? Sign in here.
Sign In Now