-
Posts
2,232 -
Joined
-
Last visited
-
Days Won
55
Content Type
Profiles
Forums
Blogs
Gallery
Events
Store
Everything posted by Glenn J
-
Charles, as promised, I pulled the FAR 111 regimental history at the Berlin State Library; There were only two commanders of the regiment: Major/Oberstleutnant August Richard Moeller (FAR 61) from formation until 28 November 1917 when he became ARKO 64 and Major Reinhold Kersten (FAR 3) I have attached a photograph of both although the quality is not great. August Moeller finished as an Oberst so in all likelihood, he is your man. Regards Glenn
-
Charles, On 27 August 1939, to celebrate the 25th anniversary of the battle of Tannenberg, certain officers who had especially distinguished themselves in WW1 and who were the holders of high orders to include the OPLM and the Austro-Hungarian MMThO were awarded a brevet or the charakter of the next highest rank to the one they already held. Regards Glenn
-
Charles, he is a captain in both photographs. Hauptmann von Frobel was promoted to that rank with a Patent of 1.10.12 K10k. The first photograph must have been taken only weeks (if that) before the oubreak of war as permission to wear the Swedish Sword Order Knight's Cross 1st Class was published in the 25 June 1914 edition of the Militär-Wochenblatt. Regards Glenn
-
Charles, born 7 October 1861 at Graudenz and indeed spent much of his earlier career at the HKA. At mobilisation he became commander of RIR 10 and promoted to Oberst on 5 September 14. Relinquished command of RIR 10 on 20 November 14 following a wound and on recovery assumed command of RIR 82 on 20 January 1915. On 2 January 1917 commander of 244. Infanterie-Brigade in 237 Infanterie-Division the East. Generalmajor on 22 March 1918 and commander of 14. Division on 9 July 1918. Plm 4 Ocober 1918 for conduct during the defensive battles in Champagne. Retired 12 August 1919. "Tannenberg" promotion to char. Generalleutnant on 27 August 1939.