-
Posts
2,232 -
Joined
-
Last visited
-
Days Won
55
Content Type
Profiles
Forums
Blogs
Gallery
Events
Store
Everything posted by Glenn J
-
Rick, Komtur, Fritz Vieth was the former 3. Lothringisches Infanterie-Regiment Nr. 135 Vieth (Hptm 1.10.13 B50b) and still in that rank in the 1919 Dienstaltersliste. Magdeburgisches J?ger-Bataillon Nr. 4 Leutnant Vieth was promoted to Oberleutnant with a Patent of 27.1.15 J52i and was still in that rank in the 1919 Dienstaltersliste. Regards Glenn
-
Hi Komtur, char. Generalleutnant Hans v. Feldmann, born 7 November 1868 in Berlin, died 10 July 1940 in Hannover. He retired as the State Secretary in the War Ministry on 7 April 1922 with the Charakter of Generalleutnant. Strangely, he appears to wear the rank of a General der Infanterie. Regards Glenn
-
Austria-Hungary Who are this gentlemen
Glenn J replied to Eduardo's topic in Austro-Hungarian Empire
-
Austria-Hungary Who are this gentlemen
Glenn J replied to Eduardo's topic in Austro-Hungarian Empire
My take: Erzherzog Leopold Salvator. Regards Glenn -
Major aD Crienitz
Glenn J replied to Stijn David's topic in Germany: Third Reich: Research, Documentation & Photographs
Stijn, Fritz Crienitz, born 26 March 1885 at Erfurt. Served as Adjutant of II./I.R. 87 before attending the War Academy from 1 October 1912 until the mobilisation in August 1914. F?hnrich: 14.11.03 Leutnant: 18.8.04 (Patent 19.8.03 B7b Oberleutnant: 18.8.12 Q13q Hauptmann: 28.11.14 H14h Regards Glenn -
Mike, Greg, that would be char. Generalleutnant z.D. Karl Justin Christian Martini (27 June 1854-10 Aug 1922). A Pionier Officer, he was commissioned as a Second-Lieutenant into the 1st Engineer Inspectorate on 12.10.1875. He rose through the ranks of Corps of Engineer/Pioneer Officers as follows: Premier-Lieutenant: 13.12.83 Hauptmann:15.10.89 Major: 13.9.99 Oberstleutnant: 10.4.06 Oberst: 24.3.09 Generalmajor: 22.4.12 Gg char. Generalleutnant: 3.11.15 His final peacetime assignment prior to retiring on 1 October 1912 was as the Inspector of the 3. Ingenieur-Inspektion at Stra?burg i.E. from 22 May 1912. He had previously been the Inspector of the 6th Fortress Inspectorate at Metz from 11 September 1909 to 22 May 1912. At the time of his promotion to char. Generalleutnant in November 1915 he was the Commandant of Maubeuge. Known awards: RAO3S, KO3, DA, BMV2X, SA2aX Regards Glenn
-
Husar or Ulan ?
Glenn J replied to Bayoswede's topic in Germany: Imperial Uniforms, Headwear, Insignia & Personal Equipment
Christer, an Unteroffizier of Westf?lisches Ulanen-Regiment Nr. 5. Red collar patches and white shoulder straps on the greatcoat. The entire Regiment was stationed in D?sseldorf from 1881 onwards. Regards Glenn -
Bob, Rick, Albert Mathias Bruno Werner Walther Engelbrecht, born 19 August 1880 at Neheim in Westphalia. Attended the Volksschule in Neheim and the Gymnasium at Schneidem?hl and at Naumburg. After receiving his Abitur he initially studied medicine briefly at the Kaiser Wilhelm Academy and then entered 4. Garde-Regiment zu Fu? on 1 April 1899 as a One-Year Volunteer". He was released into the reserve as a Sanit?ts-Gefreiter on 30 Sep 1899. Changing career course he then entered the 4. Th?ringisches Infanterie-Regiment Nr. 72 as a volunteer on 12 May 1900 and was promoted to F?hnrich on 22.7.00. He was commissioned on 18.5.01 with a predated Patent of 23.5.00 K. Leaving the army on 30 September 1904 he entered the I. Seebataillon on 1 October 1904 and was with the Marine-Detachement f?r Deutsch-Ostafrika from 21 August 1905 to 28 April 1906. He served on the S.M.S. Moltke from 1 April 1907 to 30 August 1908 and was appointed Adjutant of the I. Seebataillon on 1 October 1909. Promoted to Oberleutnant with a Patent of 27.1.10 A3a . He left Naval service on 31 March and re-entered the Army on 1 April 1912 with assignment to 1. Lothringisches Infanterie-Regiment Nr. 130. He retired on 18 October 1912. Regards Glenn
-
The Mercian Regiment
Glenn J replied to bigjarofwasps's topic in Great Britain: Research, Documentation & History
Well I for one despair at this vandalism with the history, traditions and ethos of our infantry regiments And you might have have thought they would know on an MOD site how to spell "lose" !!! Regards Glenn -
Husar or Ulan ?
Glenn J replied to Bayoswede's topic in Germany: Imperial Uniforms, Headwear, Insignia & Personal Equipment
Christer, an Unteroffizier of Hussars. Almost certainly a member of the 2. Westf?lisches Husren-Regiment Nr. 11 which had squadrons stationed in D?sseldorf for most of the second half of the nineteenth century and up to 1906. The photograph is post 1899. Regards Glenn -
Rick, Komtur, I don't have much on Herr B?nisch. On 6 August 1902 while holding the rank of Kasernen-Inspektor in Frankfurt am Main he was assigned to Mainz as the Kontrollef?hrer or section head. He was promoted to Garnison Verwaltungs Kontroleur on 17.4.03. His title of rank was changed to Garnison Verwaltungs Inspektor on 3 August 1909. He was assigned to Rathenow as the Kontrollef?hrer still in the rank of Garnison Verwaltungs Inspektor on 28 April 1910 being promoted to Garnison Verwaltungs Oberinspektor 29.6.12 which dates the photograph from after this date as he wears the two "Rosettes" of that rank. He was transfered to Stralsund on 11 July 1913. Regards Glenn
-
Portrait of Georg F?rst Musikmeister
Glenn J replied to Robert Noss's topic in Germany: Weimar Republic & Deutsche Freikorps
Robert, the following were Bandmasters of the 7. Division in 1927: Obermusikmeister Hermann Kr?mmel A./19. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Gustav Wei? III./21. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Eduard Kaufmann III./20. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Otto Kirmse I./20. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Ludwig Zimmer II./20. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Georg F?rst I./19. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Heinrich Kohn III./19. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Karl Ortner A./20. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Waldemar Kr?mmel 7. Fahr-Abteilung Obermusikmeister Max Hempel II./19. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Schifferl 7. Pionier-Bataillon Obermusikmeister Hans Sauter I./ Infanterie-Regiment 21 Obermusikmeister Grawert A./21. Infanterie-Regiment Obermusikmeister Georg Heinlein 17. Reiter-Regiment Obermusikmeister Hugo Brathuhn 7. Nachrichten-Abteilung Musikmeister Ludwig Gaul II./21. Infanterie-Regiment Musikmeister Brandt 7. Artillerie-Regiment Regards Glenn -
Having now returned from my trip to M?nchen I can offer a few pointers regarding the Kriegsarchiv on Leonrod Stra?e. The staff are indeed very helpful and friendly and the holdings there are considerable. The immediate drawbacks however are a lack of a computerised catalogue and very limited reproduction possibilities. All the Personalbogen and other files relating to commissioned officers of the Bavarian Army are there to see and these can be easily found using the card-index system there. I also understand there are similar documents for all the members of the Weimar era Landespolizei. These can then easily be ordered from a member of the archives staff and will be supplied within about ten-fifteen minutes. Of course then the problem is getting what you want reproduced. They will copy for you but it will probably take a couple to three weeks and I believe it is relatively expensive. These documents can also be a bit intimidating if you can not decipher the S?tterlin handwriting! Also available and searchable through the card indices are all the unit war diaries, Kriegsstammrollen and documentation from WW1. The second drawback: As there is no real catalogue of the huge holdings of books, one must have an idea of what you are looking for in the first place. If you have a title they will look for it and produce it if available. I also understand that an online catalogue may be in the process of being produced. There is a small library which contains all the Bavarian Milit?r-Handb?cher and Verordnungsbl?tter etc which are immediately available for use. If you are in that part of the World and you want to know about a Bavarian Officer then it is definitely the place to visit. Regards Glenn